IL SB1321 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0428
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. In the statute concerning grooming, defines "child" as a person under 17 years of age. Changes the statute concerning traveling to meet a minor. Changes the offense to traveling to meet a child. Defines "child" as a person under 17 years of age. Amends the Sex Offender Management Board Act and the Sex Offender Registration Act to make conforming changes.
Title
GROOMING&TRAVELING MEET CHILD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0428 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-001 |
2017-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-05 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-05-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 4026 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |