IL SB1315 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Municipal and the Chicago Teachers Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. In the Chicago Municipal Article, includes in the definition of "employee" any person employed by a charter school or contract school operating pursuant to an agreement with the Chicago Board of Education who is not a licensed teacher or employed in a position requiring certification or licensure under the School Code, except persons contributing to any other public employee pension system in Illinois for the same employment. Adds charter schools and contract schools to the definition of "employer". In the Chicago Teachers Article, includes in the definition of "teacher" any educational, administrative, professional, or other staff employed in a contract school operating pursuant to an agreement with the Chicago Board of Education who is employed in a position requiring certification or licensure under the School Code. Includes in the definition of "employer", a contract school operating pursuant to an agreement with the Chicago Board of Education. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHICAGO CHARTER SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-105.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1315&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1315.htm |