IL SB1304 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0425
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code and the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a person shall not be appointed as the chief, the acting chief, the department head, or a position, by whatever title, that is responsible for day-to-day operations of a fire department or fire protection district for greater than 180 days unless he or she possesses: (1) Office of the State Fire Marshal Firefighter Basic Certification or Firefighter II Certification; Office of the State Fire Marshal Fire Officer I and II Certifications; and an associate degree in fire science or a bachelor's degree from an accredited university or college; or (2) a minimum of 10 years' experience as a firefighter at the fire department, or fire protection district, in the jurisdiction making the appointment. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

APPOINTMENT OF FIRE CHIEFS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0425
2017-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2017
2017-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-025-000
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-001
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Anderson
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateDo Pass as Amended Local Government; 009-000-000
2017-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government
2017-03-29SenatePostponed - Local Government
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65510-1-7.3New CodeSee Bill Text
65510-2.1-4Amended CodeCitation Text
7070516.04bNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback