IL SB1297 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-15 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that 30 days after the effective date of the bill, the Department of Transportation shall conduct a study evaluating automated traffic law enforcement systems in this State. Provides that on or before December 31, 2019, the Department shall file a report with the General Assembly with the results from the study, including input from local law enforcement, and any recommendations the Department deems necessary. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-RED LIGHT CAMERA STUDY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-15SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2019-11-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-11-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 14, 2019
2019-11-13SenateSecond Reading
2019-11-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-11-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 13, 2019
2019-11-12SenateDo Pass Transportation; 016-000-000
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-11-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-11-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-11-06SenateAssigned to Transportation
2019-11-06SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208.6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback