IL SB1288 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that Peoria Public School District 150 may contract with a third party to provide high school equivalency testing programs. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-PEORIA-HIGH SCH EQUIV
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 3-15.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1288&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1288.htm |