IL SB1279 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0092
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Provides that the "Ticket For The Cure" scratch-off game shall be discontinued on December 31, 2016 (instead of December 31, 2011). Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Ticket For The Cure Board shall be discontinued on June 30, 2017 (instead of June 30, 2012). Effective immediately.
Title
TICKET FOR THE CURE GAME
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0092 |
2011-07-11 | Senate | Effective Date July 11, 2011 |
2011-07-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-005-003 |
2011-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2011-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-05-26 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-05-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-16 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2011-05-16 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-16 | House | Re-assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-05-16 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hunter |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2011 |
2011-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 21.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-347 | Amended Code | Citation Text |