IL SB1275 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and the Code of Civil Procedure to reenact provisions of the Act without the changes made to those provisions by Public Act 98-1132, which was held unconstitutional by the Illinois Supreme Court in Kakos v. Butler, 2016 IL 120377. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV PRO-JURIES-UNDO PA 98-1132
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tort Reform |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Re-assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Tort Reform |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 4-11001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 2-1105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1275&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1275.htm |