IL SB1267 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 29 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Railroad Supplier Diversity Act. Defines terms. Provides that each Class I railroad company shall, no later than April 15 of each year, submit to the Illinois Commerce Commission an annual report containing certain information concerning procurement goals and spending for female-owned, minority-owned, veteran-owned, and small business enterprises. Provides that the reports shall be submitted in the form and manner required by the Commission. Provides that the Commission and each railroad company subject to the Act shall hold an annual workshop open to the public on the state of supplier diversity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RAILROAD SUPPLIER DIVERSITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-29SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-29HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 107-005-000
2017-05-29HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-23HouseDo Pass / Standard Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 006-005-000
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2017-05-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-05-18HouseArrived in House
2017-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2017
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval
2017-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 012-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback