IL SB1255 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Amends the Scholarships Article of the School Code. With regard to the MIA/POW Scholarship, provides that the definition of "eligible veteran or serviceperson" includes, among other requirements, a veteran or serviceperson who is a resident of Illinois at the time of application for the Scholarship and, at some point after leaving service, was a resident of Illinois for at least 15 consecutive years. Further amends the Illinois Veteran grant program under the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Removes a provision providing that a person is a qualified applicant if he or she returned to this State within 6 months after leaving federal active duty service, or, if married to a person in continued military service stationed outside this State, returned to this State within 6 months after his or her spouse left service or was stationed within this State. Provides that a person is a qualified applicant if, despite not meeting other requirements, he or she is a resident of Illinois at the time of application to the Illinois Student Assistance Commission and, at some point after leaving federal active duty service, was a resident of Illinois for at least 15 consecutive years. Changes the definition of "qualified dependent" to include a spouse of a veteran of the United States Armed Forces who meets certain qualifications. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
VETERAN GRANT PROGRM-DEPENDENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-01-02 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-04-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-04-30 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Higher Education |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |