IL SB1231 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Directs the Secretary of State to complete a feasibility study for the implementation of a program for the issuance of digital driver's licenses. Provides that the study shall include findings on how to maximize profits to the State; the appropriate fee for a digital driver's license and how to provide for the issuance of a discounted digital driver's license; public interest in digital driver's licenses; and the cost to the State for implementation of the program. Directs the Secretary to also create a pilot program involving the issuance of digital driver's licenses for the purpose of further gauging the feasibility, interest, and efficiency of a program to issue digital driver's licenses. Requires the Secretary to report the findings of the feasibility study to the General Assembly no later than January 1, 2016. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-DIGITAL DRIVE LIC STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman |