IL SB1226 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the provision requiring the Department of Human Services to develop a training program for authorized direct care staff to administer medications under the supervision and monitoring of a registered professional nurse applies to (i) all residential (rather than all programs) for persons with a developmental disability in settings of 16 persons or fewer that are funded or licensed by the Department of Human Services and that distribute or administer medications, and (ii) all day programs certified to serve persons with developmental disabilities by the Department of Human Services. Provides that the training program for authorized direct care staff shall include educational and oversight components for staff who work in day programs that are similar to those for staff who work in residential programs. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDAA-STAFF ADM MEDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-12-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-12-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-12-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2018-12-03HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-11-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee; 006-005-000
2018-11-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-11-26HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-11-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Construction Industry & Code Enforcement Committee
2018-11-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-11-14HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-11-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-14HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
2018-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-11-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-11-07HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-23SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2017-05-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-11HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-05HouseArrived in House
2017-05-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-000
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-03-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Human Services
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170515.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback