IL SB1222 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act, the Counties Code, the Township Code, and the Illinois Municipal Code to require that, before the county board, the township board, or the corporate authorities of a municipality may vote on an officer's or employee's increase in earnings that exceeds his or her earnings for the previous calendar year by more than 6%, the county board, the township board, or the corporate authorities shall conduct a public hearing addressing the proposed increase in earnings. Requires publication of notice of the public hearing. Pre-empts home rule powers. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV EMPLOYEE-RAISE
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LC) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Assigned to Labor and Commerce |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.37 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1100.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 80-13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 3.1-50-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1222&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB1222.htm |