IL SB1198 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Music Therapy Licensing and Practice Act. Provides for licensure of music therapists by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Establishes the powers and duties of the Department, including prescribing rules defining what constitutes an appropriate curriculum for music therapy, reviewing the qualifications of applicants for licenses, investigating alleged violations of the Act, conducting hearings on disciplinary and other matters, and establishing a schedule of fees for the administration and enforcement of the Act. Establishes qualifications for licensure as a music therapist. Provides that a music therapist shall collaborate with other professionals when applicable in providing music therapy services. Provides that licenses issued under the Act shall be renewed biennially. Establishes the Music Therapy Advisory Committee. Establishes the powers and duties of the advisory committee, including advising the Department on all matters pertaining to licensure, education, and continuing education requirements for music therapists. Establishes grounds for discipline of a license. Provides for civil and criminal penalties for violations of the Act. Creates provisions concerning formal hearings, including transcripts of proceedings, appointment of hearing officers, subpoenas and depositions, and rehearings. Provides for judicial review of all final administrative decisions of the Department. Preempts home rule. Effective immediately.
Title
MUSIC THERAPY LICENSING
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Re-assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1198&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB1198.htm |