IL SB1179 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Redistricting Act of 2011. Contains only a short title provision.
Title
REDISTRICTING-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Matt Murphy [R] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] |
Rep. Angelo Saviano [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0015 |
2011-06-24 | Senate | Effective Date June 24, 2011 |
2011-06-24 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-07 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-004-000 |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Redistricting; 013-004-000 |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Redistricting |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2011-05-29 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 111-000-002 |
2011-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2011-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2011-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Redistricting; 011-000-000 |
2011-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Redistricting |
2011-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Redistricting; 006-005-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 063-053-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | Assigned to Redistricting |
2011-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Redistricting; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 031-014-000 |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |