IL SB1177 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0006
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Redistricting Act of 2011. Contains only a short title provision.
Title
REDISTRICTING-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-27 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0006 |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Effective Date June 3, 2011 |
2011-06-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 035-022-000 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Edward D. Maloney |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Redistricting; 010-006-000 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James T. Meeks |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Redistricting |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-27 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-05-27 | House | Verified |
2011-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 064-052-000 |
2011-05-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Lost |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Discharge Committee Lost |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Rules Committee; Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2011-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
2011-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2011-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Redistricting; 006-005-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 063-053-000 |
2011-05-23 | House | Assigned to Redistricting |
2011-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-22 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Redistricting; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2011-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 030-014-000 |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 4, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |