IL SB1168 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gasoline Storage Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
SAFETY-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 15 | 0.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |