IL SB1152 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipal administrative hearing unit or code hearing unit may adjudicate a violation of a county (or a participating unit of local government) ordinance or municipal ordinance of specified offenses relating to distracted driving, red light violations, and violations caught on automated traffic law enforcement systems or similar local offenses. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY&MUNI-ADMIN ADJUDICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Local Government |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Re-assigned to Local Government |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LG) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Special Issues (LG) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-43010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-2.1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 1-2.2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |