IL SB1086 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984. Makes a technical change concerning the Architect of the Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-12-15HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-11-06HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-10-27HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tim Butler
2017-10-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-10-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-10-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-10-25HouseArrived in House
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-10-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2017-10-25Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Althoff
2017-10-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-10-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-10-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-10-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-10-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-10-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-10-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-18SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-10-10SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-10-10SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
251308A-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback