IL SB1042 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0522
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mortgage Escrow Account Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Act's short title.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0522 |
2013-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2013-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2013-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2013-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-05-22 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2013-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2013-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-02 | House | First Reading |
2013-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-006-000 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 910 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |