IL SB1021 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-21 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Antitrust Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title of the Act.
Title
CIVIL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly; -Rose |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christine Radogno |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 10 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |