IL SB0956 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0039
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0039
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning tolls and charges.
Title
VEH CD-OSCILLATING LIGHTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0039 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2012 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-09 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2011-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 006-000-000 |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan |
2011-04-15 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 010-000-000 |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |