IL SB0902 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-28 - Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-28 - Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Pending: House Agriculture & Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the administration of the Code.
Title
FISH-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-28 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2010-12-28 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-12-01 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-12-01 | First Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-12-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-12-01 | Arrived in House | |
2010-12-01 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2010-12-01 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 1, 2010 | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sullivan | |
2010-11-30 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture and Conservation; 006-000-000 | |
2010-11-18 | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2010-11-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-11-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-11-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 30, 2010 | |
2010-11-18 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-11-17 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |