IL SB0898 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
Pending: House Health Care Licenses Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal date of the Acupuncture Practice Act from January 1, 2018 to January 1, 2028. Amends the Acupuncture Practice Act. Provides that all applicants and licensees shall provide a valid address and email address, which shall serve as the address and email address of record, and shall inform the Department of any change of address or email address through specified means. Provides that members of the Board of Acupuncture may not serve more than 2 consecutive full terms (rather than for more than 8 years). Eliminates certain powers and duties of the Board. Eliminates a requirement that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation seek the input of the Board on certain matters. Removes a provision allowing the Department to require a person seeking to resume active status to complete a period of evaluated clinical experience. Changes references to "registration" to references to "license". Provides that the Department has the authority and power to investigate any and all licensed activity. Removes a requirement that the Department mail a registration renewal form to registrants 60 days before the expiration of the current registration and a notice that a registration has lapsed. Makes changes to provisions concerning certification of the record to a court. Repeals provisions concerning maintaining a roster of licensed and disciplined persons. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACUPUNCTURE PRACTICE-SUNSET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-22HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-22HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Health Care Licenses Committee; Rep. Lou Lang
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-22HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-16HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
2017-03-09SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-03-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
225210Amended CodeCitation Text
2252105Amended CodeCitation Text
2252110Amended CodeCitation Text
225212New CodeSee Bill Text
2252120Amended CodeCitation Text
2252130Amended CodeCitation Text
2252140Amended CodeCitation Text
2252142New CodeSee Bill Text
2252152Amended CodeCitation Text
2252160Amended CodeCitation Text
2252170Amended CodeCitation Text
2252175Amended CodeCitation Text
2252190Amended CodeCitation Text
2252200Amended CodeCitation Text
225225Amended CodeCitation Text
225230Amended CodeCitation Text
225235Amended CodeCitation Text
225240Amended CodeCitation Text
225260Amended CodeCitation Text
225270Amended CodeCitation Text
225290Repealed CodeCitation Text
5804.28Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.38New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback