IL SB0896 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides for the forfeiture of benefits for any person who otherwise would receive a survivor benefit who is convicted of any felony relating to or arising out of or in connection with the service of the member from whom the benefit results. Provides that all participants entering service after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be deemed to have consented to that provision. Provides that the changes under the amendatory Act shall not impair any contract or vested right acquired by a survivor before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-FELONY FORFEITURE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2017-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 10-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 11-230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 12-191 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 13-807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 14-149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-187 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-199 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-149.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 18-163 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-147 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-138 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 5-227 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 6-221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-219 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 8-251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-235 | Amended Code | Citation Text |