IL SB0886 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the Department of Revenue may share information with the State Treasurer for the purpose of administering the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Amends the Uniform Disposition of Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that the State Treasurer shall, at least annually, notify the Department of Revenue of the names of persons appearing to be owners of abandoned property held by the State Treasurer, and that the Department of Revenue shall provide address and other information for such persons to the State Treasurer to facilitate the return of unclaimed property. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DOR-TREASURER-UNCLAIMED PROP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 035-022-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 035-022-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-31SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-30HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-30HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 067-048-000
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 064-049-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 064-049-000
2017-05-30HouseHome Rule Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 064-049-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 064-049-000
2017-05-30HouseFiscal Note Request is Inapplicable
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 064-049-000
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Prevailed 064-049-000
2017-05-30HouseMotion Prevailed
2017-05-30HouseMotion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-26HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 004-003-000
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-05-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-19HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-05-18HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2017-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-000-000
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-02-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355917Amended CodeCitation Text
765102519.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=886&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0886.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0886eng.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0886ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0886ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0886_04262017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0886_05302017_038000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0886_05302017_037000M.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0886_05312017_121001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0886_05312017_121000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback