IL SB0874 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In a Section concerning the issuance of tax deeds, provides that the court shall insist on substantial compliance with provisions of the Code concerning notices of sale and redemption rights. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-TAX DEED
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-27 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2016-02-24 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-05-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2015-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 22-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |