IL SB0836 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0029
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning notification of dispositions of certain criminal cases.
Title
MHDD CD-FOID CARD ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0029 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Effective Date July 10, 2015 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs 043-008-005 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 043-008-005 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 043-008-005 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-001-002 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-001-002 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2015-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-023-003 |
2015-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2015-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-002-001 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2015-05-26 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-05-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2015-04-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-16 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2015-04-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 26, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |