IL SB0776 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Student Online Personal Information Protection Act. Provides that the operator of an Internet website, online service, online application, or mobile application used primarily for K-12 school purposes and designed and marketed for K-12 school purposes shall not knowingly (1) engage in targeted advertising on the operator's site, service, or application or target advertising on any other site, service, or application when the targeting of the advertising is based upon any information that the operator has acquired because of the use of that operator's site, service, or application; (2) use information created or gathered by the operator's site, service, or application to amass a profile about a K-12 student except in furtherance of K-12 school purposes; (3) sell a student's information; or (4) disclose covered information, as defined in the Act, without the consent of a student's parent or legal guardian. Sets forth exceptions and other provisions concerning the construction and application of the Act. Effective January 1, 2016.
Title
STUDENT ONLINE PERSONAL INFO
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=776&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0776.htm |