IL SB0764 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires each public school and charter school to post, in a clearly visible location in a public area of the school that is readily accessible to students, a sign in English and in Spanish that contains the toll-free telephone number operated by the Department of Children and Family Services to receive reports of child abuse or neglect. Permits the State Board of Education to adopt rules relating to the size and location of the sign.
Title
SCH CD-CHILD ABUSE HOTLINE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0413 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 25, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Charter School Policy Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-23.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27A-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |