IL SB0761 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Governmental Ethics Act. Provides that when a legislator chooses to take official action on a matter despite the existence of a conflict situation, he or she shall (in addition to serving the public interest) also disclose that he or she is taking official action by either: (i) filing a statement with the Clerk of the House of Representatives or the Secretary of the Senate stating that he or she has a conflict regarding the specified legislative matter and that he or she is voting in the public interest; or (ii) stating on the record, during debate on the legislative matter, that he or she has a conflict regarding the legislative matter in question and that he or she is voting in the public interest.
Title
GA CONFLICT OF INTEREST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 420 | 3-203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=761&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0761.htm |