IL SB0752 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-12)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Commission Act. Provides that the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Commission shall be composed of 11 Commissioners (currently, members) that are appointed by the Governor and confirmed by the Senate. Requires at least 8 (currently, 6) commissioners of the Commission to be people who are deaf, deafblind, or hard of hearing. Specifies the membership of the Commission. Modifies the qualifications and duties of the Director of the Commission. Provides that the added Director qualifications shall apply to anyone who becomes Director on or after the effective date of this amendatory Act. Establishes the Director as the chief executive officer of the Commission. Modifies a Section concerning the powers and duties of the Commission. Defines "commissioner".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DEAF & HARD HEARING COMMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-19HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-05-03HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2017-04-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2017-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-02-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-02-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-01SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20393210Amended CodeCitation Text
20393215Amended CodeCitation Text
20393220Amended CodeCitation Text
20393225Amended CodeCitation Text
2039325Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback