IL SB0738 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0210
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the annual report of the Illinois Gaming Board.
Title
GAMING-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0210 | |
2009-08-10 | Effective Date August 10, 2009 | |
2009-08-10 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-11 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-13 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-13 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-042-000 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-06 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-05 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 011-003-000 | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to Aging Committee | |
2009-04-06 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-06 | First Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Arrived in House | |
2009-04-02 | Third Reading - Passed; 051-005-000 | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Frerichs | |
2009-04-02 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Gaming; 008-000-000 | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Gaming | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-25 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |