IL SB0724 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning enforcement actions.
Title
LIQUOR-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0010 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Effective Date May 6, 2013 |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-050-001 |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2013-04-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-04-19 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-003-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-002-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |