IL SB0705 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Excludes from the definition of "dog dealer" a person who sells dogs at retail to the public. Excludes from the definition of "day care operator" facilities where dogs or cats are held for the sole purpose of grooming or facilities where dogs or cats are held for less than 12 hours for training purposes.
Title
ANIMAL WELFARE ACT-DEFINITIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-008-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-002-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
505 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |