IL SB0696 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Further amends the Child Labor Law by changing instances of "city and county", "city and regional", and "regional" superintendent of schools to "Regional or District Superintendent of Schools" and adds definitions. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, in municipalities that require permits for special events, no person may perform, or employ, direct, or allow a person to perform, portable audiovisual rigging at a permitted special event unless the person performing such work holds a valid rigging certification from the Entertainment Technician Certification Program. Defines "portable audiovisual rigging" and "special event". Limits home rule powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD LABOR-REMOTE APPLICATION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0032
2021-06-25SenateEffective Date June 25, 2021
2021-06-25SenateGovernor Approved
2021-06-07SenateSent to the Governor
2021-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2021-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
2021-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000
2021-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2021-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2021-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura Fine
2021-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 28, 2021
2021-05-27SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000
2021-05-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote
2021-05-12HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-05-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass Labor; 016-000-000
2021-03-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-03-23SenateAssigned to Labor
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82020511Amended CodeCitation Text
82020512Amended CodeCitation Text
8202058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=696&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0696.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0696eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0696enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/102/102-0032.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0696ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0696ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0696_04232021_032028.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/senate/10200SB0696ham002_05302021_026000C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/102/house/10200SB0696_05272021_056015T.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback