IL SB0695 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Removes language providing that a Section regarding Clean Air Act rules only applies through December 31, 2021. Allows any person, including the Agency, to propose rules to amend the listing of etiologic agents identified as Class 4 agents and to consult specified classifications published by various entities. Removes provisions requiring the Pollution Control Board to adopt rules identical to a specified publication and replaces them with a requirement for the Board to take action on a proposal to amend the listing of Class 4 agents not later than 6 months after receiving it. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-CLEAN AIR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0243 |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2021 |
2021-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 109-003-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Energy & Environment Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Environment and Conservation; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 28.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 56.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |