IL SB0690 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Designations Act. Repeals the following State designations: State bird; State insect; official language; State mineral; State tree and flower; State animal; State fish; State prairie grass; State vegetable; State fruit; State fossil; State artifact; State folk dance; State theatre; State soil; State snackfood; State amphibian; State reptile; State tartan; and State pie.
Title
STATE DESIGNATIONS REPEAL
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Rooney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | To Subcommittee on State Designations |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tom Rooney |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 460 | 10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 100 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 40 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 50 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 55 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 56 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 57 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 63 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 65 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 70 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 75 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 80 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 85 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 460 | 95 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=690&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0690.htm |