IL SB0686 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for assessment years following the next general assessment after the effective date of the amendatory Act, no increase in assessment may exceed 20% per year. Provides exceptions if: (1) the property is sold, transferred, or conveyed during the taxable year; (2) significant improvements were made to the property; (3) a homestead exemption or other preferential method of assessment was removed with respect to that property during the taxable year; or (4) the increase was due to an equalization factor imposed by the township, county, or Department of Revenue. Effective immediately.
Title
PROPERTY TAX-ASSESSMENT CAP
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-02-22 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Property Taxes |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 9-145 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=686&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0686.htm |