IL SB0680 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act. Provides that used, expired, or unwanted pharmaceuticals collected by a city, village, or municipality under the Act may be destroyed in a drug destruction device by a law enforcement agency. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Expands the definition of "drug evidence" in the provision for drug destruction by a law enforcement agency to include any used, expired, or unwanted pharmaceuticals collected under the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act.
Title
EXPIRED UNUSED DRUG DISPOSAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Althoff |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 150 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 22.58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |