IL SB0675 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall, upon the request of an applicant, provide for the administration of any written examination in the Chinese, Korean, Spanish, or Vietnamese languages. Further provides that the Department shall adopt rules to ensure that the examinations are properly translated and that the examinations are consistent in terms of knowledge tested and difficulty. Provides that the Department is not required to administer a written examination in Chinese, Korean, Spanish, or Vietnamese if it determines that knowledge of the English language is a necessary qualification for the license that the applicant is seeking.
Title
COSMETOLOGY-EXAM LANGUAGES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Re-assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 410 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=675&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB0675.htm |