IL SB0669 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 27 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: Provides that "debt settlement service" does not include the services of any other originator, guarantor, or servicer of federal education loans or private education loans (rather than federal education loans). Provides that "student loan borrower" includes a parent, grandparent, or other family member who has received or agreed to pay a student loan for a family member receiving the education or any co-signer who has agreed to share responsibility for repaying a student loan with the person receiving the education. Further amends the Debt Settlement Consumer Protection Act. Provides that a debt settlement provider shall not advise or represent, expressly or by implication, that consumers should stop communicating with their creditors, lenders, loan servicers, loan guarantors, or attorneys or government entities (rather than creditors). Provides that a debt settlement provider shall not advise or represent, expressly or by implication, that consumers should stop making payments to their creditors, lenders, loan servicers, loan guarantors, or attorneys or government entities (rather than creditors). Provides that a debt settlement provider shall not access or obtain a consumer's or student loan borrower's federal student aid information in violation of federal law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDENT LOAN DEBT RELIEF

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-25SenateSent to the Governor
2021-06-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
2021-05-27SenatePassed Both Houses
2021-05-27HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000
2021-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
2021-05-26HouseThird Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
2021-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
2021-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseDo Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2021-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2021-04-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-27HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2021-04-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-27HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 22, 2021
2021-04-21SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-04-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
2021-04-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
2021-04-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Higher Education; 012-000-000
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2021-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2021-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2021-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2021-03-24SenatePostponed - Higher Education
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
2021-03-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-03-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-03-17SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2021-03-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
2021-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor
2021-03-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2021-02-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-25SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22542910Amended CodeCitation Text
225429105Amended CodeCitation Text
225429115Amended CodeCitation Text
225429125Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback