IL SB0629 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-07 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Riverboat Gambling Act. Provides that the duties of the Illinois Gaming Board include the duty to adopt rules under which all fantasy sports gaming in the State shall be conducted. Defines "fantasy sports gaming".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FANTASY SPORTS GAMING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-07SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-02-08SenateAssigned to Gaming
2017-01-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-25SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-25SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230104Amended CodeCitation Text
230105Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback