IL SB0622 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0158
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the People of the State of Illinois to release specified property located in Peoria County from all dedication and easement rights and interest acquired for highway purposes for the sum of $26,000. Authorizes the People of the State of Illinois to release and restore any rights or easements of access, crossing, light, air, and view from, to, and over specified property located in Bond County for the sum of $8,650. Authorizes the People of the State of Illinois to release and restore any rights or easements of access, crossing, light, air, and view from, to, and over specified property located in St. Clair County for the sum of $8,350. Authorizes the People of the State of Illinois to release specified property located in Grundy County from all dedication and easement rights and interest acquired for highway purposes for the sum of $8,233.33. Authorizes the People of the State of Illinois to release and restore any rights or easements of access, crossing, light, air, and view from, to, and over specified property located in Rock Island County for the sum of $5,000. Authorizes the People of the State of Illinois to release specified property located in Kankakee County from all dedication and easement rights and interest acquired for highway purposes for the sum of $2,800. Authorizes the People of the State of Illinois to release and restore any rights or easements of access, crossing, light, air, and view from, to, and over specified property located in Bond County for the sum of $3,000.00. Effective immediately.
Title
LAND TRANSFER-IDOT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0158 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date July 23, 2021 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |