IL SB0611 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0403
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Mahomet Aquifer Protection Task Force Act. Creates the Mahomet Aquifer Protection Task Force to address the issue of maintaining the clean drinking water of the Mahomet Aquifer. Contains provisions concerning the appointment of members, compensation, and the duties of the Task Force. Provides that on or before July 1, 2018 that the Mahomet Aquifer Protection Task Force shall report findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and Governor. Provides for the Act's repeal on July 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
MAHOMET AQUIFER PROTECTION
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Cynthia Soto [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0403 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2017 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 017-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-05-15 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |