IL SB0595 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0156
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that, in mortgage foreclosure actions, the plaintiff, or his or her attorney, (rather than the clerk of the court) shall send a copy of the publication to each defendant. Provides that the certificate of the plaintiff (rather than the clerk of the court) is evidence that the plaintiff sent a copy of the publication to each defendant. Provides that a copy of the certificate shall be filed at the office of the clerk of the court where the action is pending.
Title
CIV PRO-SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Thomas Bennett [R] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0156 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-05 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Civil Committee; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-27 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |