IL SB0589 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Allows a dental assistant, after being authorized by a dentist, to remove loose, broken, or irritating orthodontic appliances on a patient of record for the purpose of eliminating pain or discomfort. Provides that dental assistants who have undergone certain training may hold themselves out as expanded function dental assistants. Sets forth the training requirements for expanded function dental assistants and the services that may be provided. Provides that any procedure completed by an expanded function dental assistant must be approved by the supervising dentist and examined prior to dismissal of the patient. Sets forth certain limits on expanded function dental assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXPANDED FUNCTION DENTAL ASST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-03HouseArrived in House
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2017-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Anderson
2017-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-04-28SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2017-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-06SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2017-04-04SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2017-03-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-02-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017
2017-02-16SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-001
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-02-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-09SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-02-01SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2252517Amended CodeCitation Text
2252517.1New CodeSee Bill Text
225254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=589&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0589sam005.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB0589_05022017_008000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB0589_05262017_014000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback