IL SB0586 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning sales in error, provides that, in cases where improvements upon the property sold have been substantially destroyed or rendered uninhabitable or otherwise unfit for occupancy, the court may order assignment of the certificate of purchase to the county collector or the delinquent county tax agent instead of declaring a sale in error upon request of the county collector. Provides that, if the certificate of purchase is assigned to the county delinquent tax agent because the improvements have been substantially destroyed or rendered uninhabitable or otherwise unfit for occupancy, then the county delinquent tax agent shall extend the redemption period by 24 months. Requires the court to notify the county collector when it declares a sale in error under certain conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-SALE IN ERROR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-16HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-04-26HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-04-25HouseArrived in House
2017-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017
2017-03-14SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-02-23SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-02-22SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-01-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Jason A. Barickman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520021-310Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-315Amended CodeCitation Text
3520021-385Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback