IL SB0580 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Trusts and Trustees Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning small trust termination.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAFFICKING VICTIMS PROTECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-11-14HouseFirst Reading
2018-11-14HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-11-14HouseArrived in House
2018-11-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-11-14Senate3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
2018-11-14SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-11-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-11-07SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 13, 2018
2018-11-07SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-10-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-25SenateRe-referred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2017
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 014-000-000
2017-03-09SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76054.26Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback