IL SB0575 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Airport Authorities Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the petition to set forth a tax rate.
Title
ALEXANDER-CAIRO PORT DISTRICT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-03 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1015 | |
2010-07-08 | Effective Date July 8, 2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 047-001-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 006-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Gary Forby | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 3, 2010 | |
2010-04-30 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-039-000 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-04-28 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2010-03-12 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-03-12 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading - Passed; 041-007-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Forby | |
2010-03-11 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2010-02-22 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |