IL SB0570 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-24 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Utilities Act. Changes the repeal date for provisions authorizing natural gas surcharges to provide for recovery of costs associated with investments in qualifying infrastructure plants from December 31, 2023 to January 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITIES-SURCHARGE REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
2021-10-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2021-10-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2021-04-16SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2021-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2021-03-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2021-03-19SenateTo Subcommittee on Rate Reform and Energy
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2021-03-16SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2021-03-03SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2021-02-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-23SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-23SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22059-220.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback